TX HR1833 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Withdrawn from calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Withdrawn from calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending house parliamentarians Sharon Carter and Hugh L. Brady for their contributions during the 86th Legislative Session.
Title
Commending house parliamentarians Sharon Carter and Hugh L. Brady for their contributions during the 86th Legislative Session.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-22 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HR1833 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HR01833I.htm |