TX HR1833 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to enact legislation to expand and extend the current federal tax credit for carbon capture, utilization, and storage under Section 45Q of the Internal Revenue Code.
Title
Urging Congress to enact legislation to expand and extend the current federal tax credit for carbon capture, utilization, and storage under Section 45Q of the Internal Revenue Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Adopted RV#1811 (Y: 135 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-24 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-19 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2017-04-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CARBON CAPTURE, UTILIZATION, & STORAGE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress