TX HR182 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Vicky Sue and Jackie Paul Driskill of Lubbock on their 50th wedding anniversary.
Title
Congratulating Vicky Sue and Jackie Paul Driskill of Lubbock on their 50th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-02-18 | House | Adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-02-14 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-02-12 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-01-24 | House | Filed |