TX HR1792 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Doug and Jo Ann Morris of Campbell on their 25th wedding anniversary.
Title
Congratulating Doug and Jo Ann Morris of Campbell on their 25th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-19 | Adopted | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-11 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-09 | Filed |