TX HR1771 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Melynn Hunt on her retirement as assistant athletic director for the Lubbock Independent School District.
Title
Congratulating Melynn Hunt on her retirement as assistant athletic director for the Lubbock Independent School District.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-08 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-08 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-05-06 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-04-29 | House | Filed |