TX HR174 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 4, 2019, as Cedar Creek Lake Area Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 4, 2019, as Cedar Creek Lake Area Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-02-04 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CEDAR CREEK LAKE AREA DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates