TX HR1738 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Kenya Lyzbeth Romero Gonzalez on graduating as valedictorian of the Class of 2021 at West Mesquite High School.
Title
Congratulating Kenya Lyzbeth Romero Gonzalez on graduating as valedictorian of the Class of 2021 at West Mesquite High School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-29 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-25 | House | Filed |