TX HR1727 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Mauricio Guerrero for earning the title of salutatorian of the Class of 2019 at Wisdom High School in Houston.
Title
Congratulating Mauricio Guerrero for earning the title of salutatorian of the Class of 2019 at Wisdom High School in Houston.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-22 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Filed |