TX HR1694 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the boys' golf team from Christian Heritage Classical School in Longview on winning the 1A title at the 2021 TAPPS Golf Championship tournament.
Title
Congratulating the boys' golf team from Christian Heritage Classical School in Longview on winning the 1A title at the 2021 TAPPS Golf Championship tournament.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Dean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-29 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-24 | House | Filed |