TX HR1690 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Gabi Canales-Morgan and Gordon Morgan of Corpus Christi on the birth of their son, Praxedis Blaine Morgan.
Title
Congratulating Gabi Canales-Morgan and Gordon Morgan of Corpus Christi on the birth of their son, Praxedis Blaine Morgan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-04 | Adopted | |
2009-05-04 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-29 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-29 | Filed |
Subjects
CANALES, GABI, REP.
MORGAN, GORDON
MORGAN, PRAXEDIS BLAINE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
MORGAN, GORDON
MORGAN, PRAXEDIS BLAINE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary