TX HR1680 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-31 - Withdrawn from calendar
Status: Introduced on April 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-31 - Withdrawn from calendar
Summary
In memory of U.S. Marine Lieutenant Corporal Johnny Ray Strong.
Title
In memory of U.S. Marine Lieutenant Corporal Johnny Ray Strong.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-31 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2009-05-31 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-29 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-04 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-29 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-28 | Filed |