TX HR164 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Noah Timothy Platt of Boy Scouts of America Troop No. 226 in Plano on attaining the rank of Eagle Scout.
Title
Congratulating Noah Timothy Platt of Boy Scouts of America Troop No. 226 in Plano on attaining the rank of Eagle Scout.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-06 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed |