TX HR1613 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Jannah Collins on placing second at the African American National Spelling Bee Championships.
Title
Congratulating Jannah Collins on placing second at the African American National Spelling Bee Championships.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Elkins [R] | Rep. Helen Giddings [D] | Rep. Sylvester Turner [D] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-04-23 | House | Adopted |
2015-04-23 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-03-26 | House | Filed |