TX HR1594 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the students and organizers of Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership of North Texas for their service.
Title
Honoring the students and organizers of Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership of North Texas for their service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-01 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-01 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-04-18 | House | Filed |