TX HR158 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Ray Cogburn of Amarillo on his retirement as executive director of Region 16 Education Service Center.
Title
Congratulating Ray Cogburn of Amarillo on his retirement as executive director of Region 16 Education Service Center.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-09-02 | House | Adopted |
2021-09-02 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-09-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-09-01 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-08-31 | House | Filed |