TX HR1566 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-02 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-02 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Recognizing April 28, 2009, as Williamson County Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing April 28, 2009, as Williamson County Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-02 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-28 | Adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Rules suspended | |
2009-04-23 | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WILLIAMSON COUNTY DAY
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WILLIAMSON COUNTY DAY