TX HR154 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing Dr. Thomas Pruett of Lake Jackson for his mission work and community service.
Title
Recognizing Dr. Thomas Pruett of Lake Jackson for his mission work and community service.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Vasut [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-10-18 | House | Adopted |
2021-10-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-10-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-10-15 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-10-14 | House | Filed |