TX HR1439 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Morgan K. Register on graduating from The University of Texas at Austin.
Title
Congratulating Morgan K. Register on graduating from The University of Texas at Austin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-31 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-26 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-26 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-24 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-19 | House | Filed |