TX HR1351 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating The Woodlands High School girls' cross-country team on winning the 2008 UIL 5A state championship.
Title
Congratulating The Woodlands High School girls' cross-country team on winning the 2008 UIL 5A state championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Eissler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-27 | Adopted | |
2009-04-27 | Laid before the House | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-15 | Filed |