TX HR133 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 16, 2011, as Van Zandt County Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 16, 2011, as Van Zandt County Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | Adopted | |
2011-02-16 | Rules suspended | |
2011-01-14 | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
VAN ZANDT COUNTY DAY
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
VAN ZANDT COUNTY DAY