TX HR1324 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Jenna Warfield of the Girl Scouts of Central Texas Troop No. 287 in Austin on her receipt of the Girl Scout Gold Award.
Title
Congratulating Jenna Warfield of the Girl Scouts of Central Texas Troop No. 287 in Austin on her receipt of the Girl Scout Gold Award.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-03 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-03 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Filed |