TX HR1324 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Genaro Alejandro DeLeon of Kingsville on achieving the rank of Eagle Scout.
Title
Congratulating Genaro Alejandro DeLeon of Kingsville on achieving the rank of Eagle Scout.
Sponsors
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-04-17 | House | Adopted |
2013-04-17 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-04-03 | House | Filed |