TX HR1324 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Dora Carvajal Ramos on her retirement from the office of State Representative Jose Menendez.
Title
Congratulating Dora Carvajal Ramos on her retirement from the office of State Representative Jose Menendez.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-20 | Adopted | |
2009-04-20 | Rules suspended | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-14 | Filed |