TX HR130 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-15 - Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-15 - Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Bettye J. Glover of Cedar Park.
Title
In memory of Bettye J. Glover of Cedar Park.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-15 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-08-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-07-27 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-07-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HR130 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HR00130I.htm |