TX HR1277 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing the Celebration of Selfless Service Day hosted by BAPS Swaminarayan Sanstha on May 10, 2023, at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing the Celebration of Selfless Service Day hosted by BAPS Swaminarayan Sanstha on May 10, 2023, at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-06 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-06 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-06 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-26 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BOCHASANWASI AKSHAR PURUSHOTTAM SWAMINARAYAN SANSTHA
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary