TX HR1235 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Reported enrolled
Summary
In memory of Helen Ann Wade of Jacksonville.
Title
In memory of Helen Ann Wade of Jacksonville.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-17 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-16 | Adopted | |
2009-04-16 | Laid before the House | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-08 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-06 | Filed |