TX HR1231 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating students at Calallen Middle School on their performance in regional science fair competition.
Title
Congratulating students at Calallen Middle School on their performance in regional science fair competition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-03-26 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-26 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-03-24 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |