TX HR1224 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Robert Stoss on his retirement as assistant principal at Liberty Hill High School.
Title
Congratulating Robert Stoss on his retirement as assistant principal at Liberty Hill High School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-03-26 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-26 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-03-24 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |