TX HR1197 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 75th anniversary of the death of Marine Private First Class Charles Howard Roan and his posthumous receipt of the Congressional Medal of Honor.
Title
Commemorating the 75th anniversary of the death of Marine Private First Class Charles Howard Roan and his posthumous receipt of the Congressional Medal of Honor.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-18 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed |