TX HR1171 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Schreiner University shotgun team on winning the Division I national title at the 2019 ACUI Collegiate Clay Target Championships.
Title
Congratulating the Schreiner University shotgun team on winning the Division I national title at the 2019 ACUI Collegiate Clay Target Championships.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-18 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-09 | House | Filed |