TX HR1158 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing September 15-21, 2019, as National Child Passenger Safety Week and September 21 as National Seat Check Saturday.
Title
Recognizing September 15-21, 2019, as National Child Passenger Safety Week and September 21 as National Seat Check Saturday.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-04-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
NATIONAL CHILD PASSENGER SAFETY WEEK
NATIONAL SEAT CHECK SATURDAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
NATIONAL SEAT CHECK SATURDAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HR1158 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HR01158I.htm |