TX HR1150 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating Mexican Mother's Day on May 10, 2019.
Title
Commemorating Mexican Mother's Day on May 10, 2019.
Sponsors
Rep. Christina Morales [D] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Rep. Robert Guerra [D] | Rep. Armando Walle [D] |
Rep. Mary Perez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-18 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
MEXICAN MOTHER'S DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates