TX HR1135 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing March 28, 2017, as Permian Basin Petroleum Association Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing March 28, 2017, as Permian Basin Petroleum Association Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-28 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-03-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PERMIAN BASIN PETROLEUM ASSOCIATION DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates