TX HR1132 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Benigno Belio Villarreal of Rocksprings.
Title
In memory of Benigno Belio Villarreal of Rocksprings.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Murr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-18 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Filed |