TX HR1130 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring Bert Pfeister of San Antonio for his outstanding service as president and CEO of Respite Care.
Title
Honoring Bert Pfeister of San Antonio for his outstanding service as president and CEO of Respite Care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-13 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-09 | Adopted | |
2009-04-09 | Laid before the House | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-03-30 | Filed |