TX HR1124 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the service of Medal of Honor recipients Marvin Rex Young and Alfred Mac Wilson of Odessa.
Title
Honoring the service of Medal of Honor recipients Marvin Rex Young and Alfred Mac Wilson of Odessa.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-18 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-04 | House | Filed |