TX HR1099 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Brock Buckingham, Kabir Bhakta, and Mark Herndon of Kelton High School on winning the Division 1A-4A FIRST Tech Challenge at the 2018 UIL Robotics State Championship.
Title
Congratulating Brock Buckingham, Kabir Bhakta, and Mark Herndon of Kelton High School on winning the Division 1A-4A FIRST Tech Challenge at the 2018 UIL Robotics State Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Filed |