TX HR1094 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the boys' and girls' soccer teams of Lamar High School in Houston on winning district championships in 2023.
Title
Congratulating the boys' and girls' soccer teams of Lamar High School in Houston on winning district championships in 2023.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-04-20 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-20 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-04-20 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-13 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-12 | House | Filed |