TX HR1088 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Frederich Reinhardt Schauer IV of Beeville on his success at the Fort Worth Stock Show.
Title
Congratulating Frederich Reinhardt Schauer IV of Beeville on his success at the Fort Worth Stock Show.
Sponsors
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-04-01 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-03-21 | House | Filed |