TX HR1086 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the Order of the Eastern Star in Boerne on the 100th anniversary of its founding.
Title
Honoring the Order of the Eastern Star in Boerne on the 100th anniversary of its founding.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-04-13 | Adopted | |
2011-04-13 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-03-29 | Filed |