TX HR1078 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Margaret and Jim Perkins on receiving the 2023 Texas Higher Education Distinguished Service Award.
Title
Congratulating Margaret and Jim Perkins on receiving the 2023 Texas Higher Education Distinguished Service Award.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-04-20 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-20 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-04-20 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-13 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-12 | House | Filed |