TX HR1075 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring the Greater Irving-Las Colinas Chamber of Commerce for earning a five-star accreditation from the U.S. Chamber of Commerce.
Title
Honoring the Greater Irving-Las Colinas Chamber of Commerce for earning a five-star accreditation from the U.S. Chamber of Commerce.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-13 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-09 | Adopted | |
2009-04-09 | Laid before the House | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |