TX HR1041 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Joe Morales on his retirement as assistant principal of Memorial Junior High in Eagle Pass ISD.
Title
Congratulating Joe Morales on his retirement as assistant principal of Memorial Junior High in Eagle Pass ISD.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Filed |