TX HR103 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Alyssa Franklin on the birth of her daughter, Ava Marie Spikes, on January 1, 2019.
Title
Congratulating Alyssa Franklin on the birth of her daughter, Ava Marie Spikes, on January 1, 2019.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-06 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed |