TX HR1029 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-02 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-02 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring the Mustang Stampede of J.J. Pearce High School in Richardson.
Title
Honoring the Mustang Stampede of J.J. Pearce High School in Richardson.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Kent [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-02 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-03-30 | Adopted | |
2009-03-30 | Rules suspended | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-03-24 | Filed |