TX HR101 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Lake Ridge High School Wind Symphony on its selection as a 2021 National Winner in the Foundation for Music Education Mark of Excellence contest.
Title
Congratulating the Lake Ridge High School Wind Symphony on its selection as a 2021 National Winner in the Foundation for Music Education Mark of Excellence contest.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-10-14 | House | Adopted |
2021-10-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-10-14 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-10-13 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-10-12 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-10-11 | House | Filed |