TX HR1007 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the centennial of the death of frontier hero U.S. Army Brigadier General John Lapham Bullis.
Title
Commemorating the centennial of the death of frontier hero U.S. Army Brigadier General John Lapham Bullis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-04-07 | Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Laid before the House | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-03-30 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-03-22 | Filed |