TX HJR99 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment requiring the denial of bail to certain persons arrested for an offense resulting in the death of or serious bodily injury to a person younger than 18 years of age.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment requiring the denial of bail to certain persons arrested for an offense resulting in the death of or serious bodily injury to a person younger than 18 years of age.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-01 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments