TX HJR61 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2014 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment relating to the right to hunt, fish, and harvest wildlife.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment relating to the right to hunt, fish, and harvest wildlife.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-29HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-03-31HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-03-31HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-03-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2015-02-26HouseRead first time
2014-12-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback