TX HJR61 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment changing the terms of office of a district judge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment changing the terms of office of a district judge.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-05 Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2011-05-05 Record vote
2011-05-05 Failed of adoption
2011-05-05 Read 3rd time
2011-05-04 Reason for vote recorded in Journal
2011-05-04 Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2011-05-04 Record vote
2011-05-04 Passed to engrossment
2011-05-04 Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2011-05-04 Read 2nd time
2011-05-04 Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2011-05-02 Considered in Calendars
2011-04-13 Committee report sent to Calendars
2011-04-12 Committee report distributed
2011-04-12 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2011-04-04 Reported favorably as substituted
2011-04-04 Committee substitute considered in committee
2011-04-04 Considered in public hearing
2011-03-28 Left pending in committee
2011-03-28 Committee substitute considered in committee
2011-03-28 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2011-03-28 Considered in public hearing
2011-03-28 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2011-02-21 Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2011-02-21 Read first time
2011-01-11 Filed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback